VINEET BHATNAGAR
-
About VINEET BHATNAGAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51900MH1968NPL013966 COUNCIL FOR FAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES 0.0 Active 28/08/2008 - U65921MH2007PTC170071 PHILLIP CENTRALISED SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 20185000.0 Active 18/04/2007 - U65999GJ2017PTC098285 PHILLIP VENTURES IFSC PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Active 13/07/2017 - U65999MH1996PTC195393 PHILLIP FINANCE & INVESTMENT SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 2646400.0 Active 03/06/2008 - U67110MH2005PTC157770 PHILLIP (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 22325000.0 Active 02/12/2005 - U67120MH2003PTC142627 PHILLIP COMMODITIES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 49500000.0 Active 10/10/2003 - U67120MH2004PTC144480 MF GLOBAL CAPITAL INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Amalgamated 11/02/2004 - U67190MH1999PTC121978 REFCO (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 21675020.0 Under Liquidation 28/09/1999 - U67190MH2014PTC260428 PHILLIP SERVICES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 10500000.0 Active 26/12/2014 - U74999MH2016NPL288983 GIVEBACK FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 27/12/2016 - U92403MH1999PTC123359 PHILLIPCAPITAL (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 518942000.0 Active 29/12/1999 - -
Associated with Directors