VIJAY KUMAR KEJRIWAL
-
About VIJAY KUMAR KEJRIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB1990PTC049817 ANUBHA HOLDINGS PVT LTD 19127000.0 Active 31/08/2005 - U70101WB2007PTC117644 SILVER SPOON DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/11/2007 - U85110WB1994PTC061512 ALPHA MEDICAL SERVICES PVT. LTD. 11223600.0 Active 20/01/1994 - U85110WB2003PTC097398 ALPHA EDUCARE & HEALTH CARE PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 11/12/2003 - U91990WB1946GAP013261 HINDUSTAN CLUB LTD 0.0 Active 27/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors