VIKRAM SARAOGI
-
About VIKRAM SARAOGI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB1970PTC030164 SURESH KUMAR GANERIWALA PVT LTD 3131000.0 Active 25/09/2001 - U51109WB1995PTC069214 JAGAJYOTI COMMODITIES PVT LTD 14207400.0 Active 24/11/1995 - U51109WB1996PTC079792 CHAHAK CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 2320200.0 Active 08/06/1996 - U67190WB2007PTC120741 PIONEER MONEY INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 19/12/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
BAJRANG LAL SARAOGI Director SAURABH KUMAR Director VIVEK SARAOGI Director ATMA RAM SARAOGI Director