VISHNU PRASAD GARG
-
About VISHNU PRASAD GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14200MP2008PTC020833 REGENCY MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/06/2008 - U15141MP1996PTC010336 REGENCY AGRO PRODUCTS PVT LTD 5000000.0 Active 08/01/1996 - U45201MP2003PTC015885 RUCHI BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/06/2003 - U55101MP1986PTC003352 S.B.HOTELS PVT.LTD. 2479000.0 Active 03/04/1996 - U55101MP1995PTC009588 REGENCY HOTELS AND INVESTMENTS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 20/06/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
MAYANK GARG Director PAWAN AGARWAL Director KAMLESH GARG Director NEETIKA GARG Director