VISHWAS RAMKRISHNA UDPIKAR
-
About VISHWAS RAMKRISHNA UDPIKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29213PN2010FTC136766 IFM ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 06/07/2010 - U29299PN2008PTC131779 DEMA MECHATRONICS TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1414000.0 Active 08/04/2008 - U30007MH1997PTC110912 WAVELET TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1005100.0 Active 25/09/1997 - U72100PN1998PTC013005 SCI-COM SOFTWARE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 05/11/1998 - U91112PN1999PTC013261 DEMA MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 01/10/2011 - -
Associated with Directors