VINAMRA AGARWAL
-
About VINAMRA AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40300UP2010PTC041611 TA GREENTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 50200000.0 Active 30/01/2016 - U45202UP1989PLC010606 T A TRANSFORMERS LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 16/10/2003 - U45400UP2012PTC049105 VIBHUTI INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/02/2012 - U45400UP2012PTC049115 ADIDEV INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 29/02/2012 - U45400UP2012PTC049132 SADGURU KRIPA TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 29/02/2012 - U45400UP2012PTC049153 CHIDANAND ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 01/03/2012 - U45400UP2012PTC049173 MAHADEV INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100020.0 Active 31/01/2018 - U65910UP2002PTC026637 AGARWAL FIN-LEASE AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 1100200.0 Active 03/05/2002 - U65910UP2002PTC026638 VINAMRA FIN-LEASE AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 1000200.0 Active 03/05/2002 - U65993UP1992PTC014631 CHINHAT LAND AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 1515200.0 Active 24/03/2003 - U99999MH1970GAP014629 INDIAN ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS MANUFACFTURERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 22/09/2015 - -
Associated with Directors