VINEET CHANDRA RAI
-
About VINEET CHANDRA RAI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65910AP1998PLC088941 JAIN SONS FINLEASE LIMITED 448918830.0 Active 27/07/2012 - U72300MH2011PTC222535 ELECTRONIC PAYMENT AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 32589480.0 Active 01/11/2012 - U74140MH2006PTC160551 AAVISHKAAR VENTURE MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 15394760.0 Active 17/03/2006 - U74140WB1991PTC053189 AROHAN FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 825623680.0 Active 24/10/2013 - U74900MH2007PTC173381 AAVISHKAAR VENTURE TRUSTEES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2007 - U74999MH2016PTC282026 TRIBETECH PRIVATE LIMITED 240000.0 Active 29/05/2017 - U74999TG2002PTC075765 INTELLECTUAL CAPITAL ADVISORY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 9329320.0 Active 05/03/2002 - -
Associated with Directors