VIKAS AGARWAL
-
About VIKAS AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15115AS2018PTC018363 FARMGRAM FOODBEV PRIVATE LIMITED 60000.0 Active 23/02/2018 - U15143AS1995PTC004488 PURVANCHAL AROMATICS PVT LTD 9212000.0 Active 24/10/2013 - U23109AS1999PLC005750 S M COKES LIMITED 25957000.0 Active 05/01/2015 - U27104AS1996PLC004876 BITCHEM ASPHALT TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 5715000.0 Active 01/11/2010 - U27105ML2003PTC007234 DYNA ROOF PRIVATE LIMITED 10919060.0 Active 29/09/2005 - U27107AS1987PLC002723 SHREE KAMRUP ROOFINGS LIMITED 30000000.0 Amalgamated 20/12/2007 - U45203AS2010PLC010103 SM ENGINEERS INDIA LIMITED 2700000.0 Active 20/07/2010 - U45400WB2014PLC199769 BANGBHUMI DEVELOPERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/11/2014 - U51909AS1981PLC007406 SM CORPORATION LIMITED 5113970.0 Active 02/11/2004 - U52190WB2010PTC154973 MANGALMURTI COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 2650800.0 Active 15/11/2014 - U55101ML2007PTC008290 AURA HOTELS & RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 227955650.0 Active 17/10/2011 - U65100AS2011PTC010355 SM SONS HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 147200000.0 Active 30/09/2013 - U70101AS2012PTC011313 SM JDB ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 558932250.0 Active 17/10/2012 - U74900AS2012PTC011353 THINKS ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 52600100.0 Active 29/11/2012 - U74999WB2010PTC153323 SIMPLICITY ESTATE ADVISORY PRIVATE LIMITED 4128640.0 Active 10/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors