VIPUL JAYANTILAL MODI
-
About VIPUL JAYANTILAL MODI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L28122MH2011PLC214373 SUPREMEX SHINE STEELS LIMITED 31540000.0 Active 04/03/2011 - L67190MH2011PLC214318 INTELLIVATE CAPITAL ADVISORS LIMITED 31054810.0 Active 03/03/2011 - U45200MH1995PTC090940 GALAXY REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/07/1995 - U45200MH1995PTC091627 JIMEET DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/1996 - U45250MH1993PTC071509 NIRALEE PROPERTIES PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 07/04/1993 - U51900MH1989PTC053704 BOMBAY EXIM PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 20/07/1990 - U65910GJ1995PLC025229 SAMRUDDHI FINSTOCK LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 24/12/1996 - U65990MH1996PTC100294 JINAL FIN-VEST PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/1997 - U67120MH2004PLC146183 SAMCO SECURITIES LIMITED 4000000.0 Active 10/05/2004 - U70100MH1995PTC086403 ANISH PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/1995 - U70100MH1995PTC086574 SARIA BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/1995 - U70100MH1995PTC095038 HANSA VILLA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/04/2007 - U70101MH1994PTC076944 PIYALI BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/06/1994 - U74140MH2010PTC200319 VM MANAGEMENT CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 03/02/2017 - U74999MH2015PTC262652 SAMCO VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 196800000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors