VIKAS VIJAY BHAI AGARWAL
-
About VIKAS VIJAY BHAI AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U02001WB1997PTC082490 KAVERY LAMINART PRIVATE LIMITED 1002000.0 Active 24/09/2014 - U02002WB1999PTC088657 KRISHNA DECOR PVT LTD 25995810.0 Active 24/09/2014 - U20212GJ2002PLC040412 SALASAR LAMINATES LIMITED 60986120.0 Active 30/01/2002 - U20219GJ2007PTC050348 HERITAGE PLY BOARD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/03/2007 - U20219GJ2007PTC052362 HERITAGE INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 543500.0 Active 17/12/2007 - U20232GJ2009PTC058284 SALASAR AGROPANEL PRIVATE LIMITED 13860010.0 Active 08/10/2009 - U20290GJ2004PLC045171 HERITAGE BOARD LIMITED 35381000.0 Active 17/12/2004 - U74999GJ2017NPL098931 INDIAN LAMINATE MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION 100000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors