VIVEK LAMMANDAS HUNDLANI
-
About VIVEK LAMMANDAS HUNDLANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24230GJ2006PLC047591 REGENT HEALTHCARE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 25/01/2006 - U24231GJ1996PLC029657 COSMOS REMEDIES LIMITED 20300000.0 Active 25/07/2009 - U45201GJ2007PTC051671 AARAADHAK INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2010 - U45403GJ2007PTC051665 EASHAN INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2010 - U51909DL2008PTC185865 VATSALA EXPOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/12/2013 - U51909GJ1994PLC023972 BOSCOGEN OVERSEAS LIMITED 1942200.0 Active 25/01/2006 - -
Associated with Directors