VIKASH PARASURAMPURIA
-
About VIKASH PARASURAMPURIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14219WB2007PTC113650 SOHAN MINERALS AND MINING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 12180300.0 Active 01/09/2014 - U29303WB2003PTC096393 SUBHAM FAN INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 14/01/2013 - U51226WB1987PTC042722 DEV TRADING ENTERPRISES PVT LTD 200000.0 Active 01/04/2001 - U52110WB1988PTC044002 SHAKTI COMMERCIAL PVT LTD 4642000.0 Active 23/03/1988 - -
Associated with Directors
AMIT SHARMA Director MAHESH KEJRI WAL Director VISHWANATH SUREKA Director