VEDANT BIRLA
-
About VEDANT BIRLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L29220MH1986PLC041214 BIRLA PRECISION TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 105303512.0 Active 18/05/2016 - U45200MH1932PLC001850 SHRINIKA INFRA LIMITED 94500000.0 Active 01/08/2013 - U51502MH2015PTC262332 BIRLA LIFESTYLE CONSUMER PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U65990MH1962PTC014209 ASIAN DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 9625000.0 Active 17/03/2015 - U70102MH2014PTC259477 BIRLA INFRASTRUCTURE AND CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/11/2014 - U70102MH2014PTC259579 BIRLA INFRASTRUCTURE AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/11/2014 - U99999MH1923PTC001084 BIRLA BOMBAY PRIVATE LIMITED 6600000.0 Active 17/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors