VENKATESH SUBRAMANIAN
-
About VENKATESH SUBRAMANIAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13100MH2001PLC131680 FIELD MINING AND ISPATS LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 30/04/2012 10/03/2014 U40101TG2002PTC039426 SAI MAITHILI POWER COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 43300000.0 Active 28/04/2012 - U40101TG2004PLC061239 SAI LILAGAR POWER GENERATION LIMITED 755000000.0 Active 14/06/2013 - U40105TN2002PTC055046 SAI REGENCY POWER CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 214800000.0 Active 03/05/2012 - U40109TG2005PLC046893 SITAPURAM POWER LIMITED 480000000.0 Active 10/09/2016 - U40109TG2005PLC047917 SAI WARDHA POWER GENERATION LIMITED 8388824380.0 Active 03/05/2012 - U40109TG2005PTC047594 KSK ELECTRICITY FINANCING INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 5701153050.0 Active 04/05/2012 - U40109TG2005PTC047719 KSK NARMADA POWER COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 28/04/2012 - U40109TG2005PTC047720 KSK VIDARBHA POWER COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 28/04/2012 - U40109TG2005PTC047721 KSK WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 49100000.0 Active 01/03/2012 - -
Associated with Directors