VISHNU SHARMA
-
About VISHNU SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26942WB1992PLC056074 KAPOORS SIAM VIDHYA FINANCE LIMITED 50701320.0 Active 25/04/2013 - U51101WB2010PTC143475 RUPNARAYAN DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 308000.0 Active 24/12/2013 - U51109WB1995PTC074058 MONOLISHA MANAGEMENT PVT.LTD. 9982000.0 Active 08/10/2014 - U51909WB2009PTC134855 MATESHWARI TIEUP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/12/2015 - U51909WB2010PTC144034 PANORAMA DEALER PRIVATE LIMITED 9581100.0 Active 24/05/2012 - U70101WB1999PTC089744 PRAVIK DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3579000.0 Active 08/10/2014 - U74900WB2010PTC143358 RSPS LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 18759600.0 Active 24/05/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
RAKESH KAPOOR Director DINESH KAPOOR Director ASHOK KUMAR KOCHAR Director HULAS CHAND CHORARIA Director