VIKAS GULIANI
-
About VIKAS GULIANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U28998HR2010PTC053099 SHREE HARI OM UTENSILS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/08/2014 - U36101HR2010PTC053098 SHREE BALAJI POTTERY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/08/2014 - U90000HR2009PLC039778 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (ALIGARH) LIMITED 65000000.0 Active 29/08/2014 - U90000HR2010PLC041510 ECOGREEN ENVIROTECH SOLUTIONS LIMITED 11500000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U90000HR2010PTC040688 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (NAINITAL) PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/08/2014 - U90001HR2009PLC039773 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (MERRUT) LIMITED 160000000.0 Active 01/09/2014 - U90001HR2010PLC041511 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (BALIA) LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U90002HR2010PLC041513 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (MIRZAPUR) LIMITED 25000000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U90002HR2010PLC041517 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (FATEHPUR) LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U90002HR2010PLC041520 A2Z WASTE MANAGEMENT (SAMBHAL) LIMITED 15150000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors