VIJAY YASHWANT CHIPLUNKAR
-
About VIJAY YASHWANT CHIPLUNKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40100DL2005PLC257673 SIKKIM HYDRO POWER VENTURES LIMITED 627359420.0 Active 27/10/2016 - U40102MH2007PLC173416 HARYANA BIOMASS POWER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 08/01/2018 - U40108DL2010PTC210977 TANGRI RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/12/2016 - U45200MH2006PLC159107 GAMMON PROJECTS DEVELOPERS LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U45203DL2010PLC202526 LILAC INFRAPROJECTS DEVELOPERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/12/2016 - U45309MH2007PLC171578 GAMMON LOGISTICS LIMITED 25500000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U61100MH2007PLC168759 MARINE PROJECT SERVICES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U70102MH2008PLC185427 JAGUAR PROJECTS DEVELOPERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U74900MH2010PTC210430 SEGUE INFRASTRUCTURE PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U74990MH2010PTC210401 CHITOOR INFRA COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors