VIVEK KUMAR SINGH
-
About VIVEK KUMAR SINGH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L63000MH1988PLC048500 SHREYAS SHIPPING AND LOGISTICS LIMITED 219575330.0 Active 01/06/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC299641 SHREYAS-SUZUE LOGISTICS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 12/09/2017 - U91990MH1979GAP021664 INDIAN NATIONAL SHIPOWNERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 29/09/2017 - U92412MH2008NPL177582 TRANSWORLD CULTURAL AND SPORTS FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 14/10/2017 - -
Associated with Directors