YATISH SOIRU DEMPO
-
About YATISH SOIRU DEMPO,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U61100MH1994PTC077698 MODEST INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 835817580.0 Active 27/07/2012 - U63040GA1983PTC000552 DEMPO TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/11/2015 - U65993GA1984PTC000570 V.S.DEMPO HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 500550.0 Active 09/11/2015 - U65993GA1992PTC001206 CELTIC INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 30/03/2016 - U74210GA1963PTC000009 DEMPO SHIPBUILDING AND ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 671525000.0 Active 27/12/2005 - -
Associated with Directors