YEDLA VASUDEVA RAO
-
About YEDLA VASUDEVA RAO,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40106DL2008PTC177621 AEOLUS RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 4359140.0 Active 05/05/2008 - U40106DL2010PTC205480 ADISHANKAR KHUITAM POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 8933060.0 Active 08/07/2010 - U40109DL2007PTC162867 ADISHANKAR POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 11692000.0 Active 03/05/2007 - U40300DL2011PTC216108 LOWER SIMANG POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2011 - U45400DL2011PTC213579 KAMAKHYA INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/02/2011 - U70102DL2008PTC178759 YEDLA INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/05/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
SEETHAYYA KADIMCHERLA Director NIHARIKA YEDLA Director GOVINDA RAJU YEDLA Director