YASHVARDHAN SHRIKANT AGARWAL
-
About YASHVARDHAN SHRIKANT AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100MH1989PTC050275 TRINITY INDIA FORGETECH PRIVATE LIMITED 8000000.0 Active 14/05/2010 - U27108MH1999PTC123176 SMITA STEELS ROLLING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 81992000.0 Active 01/03/2012 - U27200MH1987PTC042968 ANKLESHWAR METAL INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1380300.0 Active 01/09/2013 - U70100MH2002PTC138046 FM LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2011 - -
Associated with Directors