YASH KUMAR SEHGAL
-
About YASH KUMAR SEHGAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15520HP1934PLC000135 MOHAN MEAKIN LIMITED 42542395.0 Active 26/09/2011 - L55101DL1979PLC009498 CHL LIMITED 109637000.0 Active 25/09/2013 - U15500MH1970PLC014512 MOHAN ROCKY SPRING WATER BREWERIES LIMITED 5717040.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U65990MH1993PLC072984 TAURUS INVESTMENT TRUST COMPANY LIMITED 980800.0 Active 27/06/2015 - U74140DL2007PTC159341 MALBROS HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 215395300.0 Active 01/05/2013 - U74999HR2005PLC039812 CHL (SOUTH) HOTELS LIMITED 117280600.0 Active 04/02/2015 - -
Associated with Directors